UT SB0064 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bureau of Emergency Medical Services Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bureau of Emergency Medical Services Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-13SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-10SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-02-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-17 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-15 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-15SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2023-02-15SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2023-02-15SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2023-02-15HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2023-02-15HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-10HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-10HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-10HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-08HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-07HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-02-03HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2023-02-03HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-30SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-30SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-23SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-23SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-20SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-17SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-17SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-01-17SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-01-11SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-01-04 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-01-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
102425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1148103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
261826Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2621209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
262132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2655102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2694Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26B1204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3455102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34A2102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
531104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5310405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5321101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
58378Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5912801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A151401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A15629Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J1602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63M7209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
67202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7210502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
763203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7723213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78A6209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78B4501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78B5902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78B5904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78B8401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
803404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
803504Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SB0064.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0064.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0064S01.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillamd/SB0064S01.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillenr/SB0064.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/sb0064s01.sfap.01.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/sb0064s01.sfap.02.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0064.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0064S01_ComparedWith_SB0064.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0064S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=25728
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=287&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=332&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27014
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=575&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback