UT SB0060 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Accident Reports Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident Reports Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-15SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-12SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-17 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-11 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2021-02-11SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2021-02-11SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2021-02-11HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2021-02-11HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-02-10HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-02-10HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-09HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-01HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-01-27HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-01-27HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2021-01-22SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2021-01-22SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-21SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-21SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-14SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-12SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-11 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
539107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63G2103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback