UT SB0059 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Child Welfare Worker Protections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare Worker Protections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-14SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-13SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-13SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-05SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-29SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-28SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-26SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-25SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-08 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-08 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-08 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback