UT SB0058S02 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0058S01
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Sales and Use Tax
Title
Amendments to Sales and Use Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-07 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-07 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-02-27 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSTREV |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTREV |
2013-02-13 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTREV |
2013-02-13 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTREV |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTREV |
2013-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTREV |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTREV |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTREV |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTREV |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0058S01 (Replaces) 2013-02-12 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSUB