UT SB0055 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Signatures
Title
Electronic Signatures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-04 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |