UT SB0053 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0053S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Private Investigator Regulations
Title
Amendments to Private Investigator Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0053S01 (Replaced by) 2014-02-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0053.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0053.pdf |