UT SB0053 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate/ circled in S3RD
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate/ circled in S3RD
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eligibility for Interscholastic Activities in Secondary Schools
Title
Eligibility for Interscholastic Activities in Secondary Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-18 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |