UT SB0050 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Victims' Rights Revisions
Title
Victims' Rights Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-25 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-02-24 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-24 | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-24 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-22 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTJUD | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-04 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC | |
2010-01-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |