UT SB0048 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Flag Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Flag Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2021-02-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Substituted Bill
2021-02-24HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2021-02-24HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-05HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-02-05HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-02-05SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-05SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-01SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-01SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-29SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-29SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-25SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-25SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-01-22SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-14SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-12SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-12-21 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3629101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2263Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/SB0048.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0048.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0048S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0048S03.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0048s04.hfa.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0048s04.hfa.02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0048S01_ComparedWith_SB0048.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0048S02_ComparedWith_SB0048S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0048S03_ComparedWith_SB0048S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048S03.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0048S04_ComparedWith_SB0048S03.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0048S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18431
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=135&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=321&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20277
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20278

Bill Comments

feedback