UT SB0048 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Camping Fees Amendments
Title
Camping Fees Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/SB0048.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/sbillint/SB0048.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/SB0048.fn.pdf |