UT SB0044S01 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation SB0044

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Workers' Compensation and Employee Misconduct

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation and Employee Misconduct

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-29 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2014-03-20 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-20SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2014-03-19SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2014-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2014-03-04 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-03 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-03 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-03SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-03-03SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-03SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-03HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2014-03-03HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in HCON
2014-02-28HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HCON
2014-02-28HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTBUS
2014-02-28HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS
2014-02-28HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTBUS
2014-02-25HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-25HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-02-25HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2014-02-25HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2014-02-25SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2014-02-24SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2014-02-24SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2014-02-13SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND
2014-02-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND
2014-02-11SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-02-11SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTEDW
2014-02-10SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW
2014-02-10SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTEDW
2014-02-07SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTEDW
2014-01-29SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW
2014-01-29SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL
2014-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-01-24SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2014-01-23 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-01-23 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0044 (Replaces) 2014-02-11 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback