UT SB0044 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Payment in Lieu of Taxes Funds for Counties
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes Funds for Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Appropriations
Counties
County and Municipal Finance
Federalism
Finance
Fiscal Procedures
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Lands
Revenue and Taxation
State Treasurer
Counties
County and Municipal Finance
Federalism
Finance
Fiscal Procedures
Government Operations (State Issues)
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Lands
Revenue and Taxation
State Treasurer