UT SB0036 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Local Option Sales and Use Tax Distribution Formula Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Option Sales and Use Tax Distribution Formula Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2018-03-16 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2018-03-16SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2018-03-16SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-02-13 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-02-13 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-02-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-02-13SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2018-02-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2018-02-12SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2018-02-12HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2018-02-12HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-01-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-01-24HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-01-24HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2018-01-24HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2018-01-24SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-01-22SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-01-22SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-01-16SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-01-16SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-12-15 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-15 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-15 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-12 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback