UT SB0035 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reciprocal Professional Licensing Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reciprocal Professional Licensing Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-13SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-10SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2023-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-03-02 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-02 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-02 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-03-02SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2023-03-01HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2023-03-01HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2023-03-01SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2023-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-03-01SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-03-01HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-28HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2023-02-09HouseHouse/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee
2023-02-09HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Substituted Bill
2023-02-09HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-09HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in House Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-08HouseSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-08HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-07HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2023-02-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-02-06HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-02-03HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-03SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Substituted Bill
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-01SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-24SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-24SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-23SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-23SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-17SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-17SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-01-17SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-01-11SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2022-12-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2022-12-19 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SB0035.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0035.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0035S01.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0035S02.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0035S03.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillamd/SB0035S03.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillenr/SB0035.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/sb0035s03.hfa.01.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/sb0035s03.hfap.01.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0035.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0035S01_ComparedWith_SB0035.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0035S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0035S02_ComparedWith_SB0035S01.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0035S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0035S03_ComparedWith_SB0035S02.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0035S03.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=25774
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=25786
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=295&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=326&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=26932
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=26933
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1192&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1694&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback