UT SB0034S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0034
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0034S02
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0034S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Governance of the Utah Education and Workforce Alliance
Title
Governance of the Utah Education and Workforce Alliance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTEDU |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTEDU |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2014-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTEDU |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTEDU |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-12-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0034 (Replaces) 2014-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
SB0034S02 (Replaced by) 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
SB0034S02 (Replaced by) 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB