UT SB0031 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute Lobbyist Disclosure and Regulation Act Amendments
Title
Substitute Lobbyist Disclosure and Regulation Act Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Sen. Mike McKell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2015-03-23 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2015-03-12 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2015-03-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-11 | House/ 2nd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-02-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-17 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-17 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2014-12-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2014-12-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |