UT SB0028 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Radon Related Amendments
Title
Radon Related Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Environmental Quality
Department of Government Operations
Education
Environment
Facilities, Construction, and Management
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Board of Education
Department of Government Operations
Education
Environment
Facilities, Construction, and Management
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Board of Education