UT SB0028 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Election Law Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2020-03-28 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2020-03-28SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2020-03-20SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-27 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-27 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-27 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-27SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-02-26SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-26SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-26HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2020-02-26HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-25HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-25HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee
2020-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2020-02-21HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2020-02-20HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2020-02-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-19HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-02-19HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-02-19HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2020-02-19SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-02-18SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-02-18SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-18SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-11SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-09SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-05SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-05SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2020-02-04SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2020-02-04SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2020-01-30SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2020-01-28SenateSenate/ 3nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2020-01-28SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-01-27SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-01-27SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-01-27SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-01-27SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-12-23 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-12-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/SB0028.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SB0028.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SB0028S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SB0028S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillenr/SB0028.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0028.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0028S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0028S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0028S03.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=42&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=14672
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=14674
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=319&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=342&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15927
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=493&house=H

Bill Comments 750

feedback