UT SB0022 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Notary Public Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notary Public Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-26 Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
2010-01-25 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2010-01-25 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2010-01-07 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SSEC
2009-12-17 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2009-12-14 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2009-12-10 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback