UT SB0015 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce Solutions for Air Quality Amendments
Title
Workforce Solutions for Air Quality Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-22 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-12-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Air Quality
Department of Human Resource Management
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Officers and Employees
Department of Human Resource Management
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Officers and Employees