UT SB0014 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Building and Construction Projects - Technical Corrections
Title
Building and Construction Projects - Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-11 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-02-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-02-03 | House/ circled in H3RDSB | |
2010-01-29 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-01-29 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-01-26 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-26 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-01-26 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-06 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SSEC | |
2009-12-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2009-12-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |