UT SB0011 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Education Recodification - Local Administration
Title
Public Education Recodification - Local Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-01-23 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-01-22 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-01-22 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-01-22 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-01-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-01-22 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Education
Flag (American)
Gangs
Impact Fees
Local Boards of Education
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
Recodification
School Personnel
School Safety
Education
Flag (American)
Gangs
Impact Fees
Local Boards of Education
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
Recodification
School Personnel
School Safety