UT SB0005 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environmental Quality Base Budget
Title
Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environmental Quality Base Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-02 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-27 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-01-27 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-01-26 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-01-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-01-26 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2023-01-26 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2023-01-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-01-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-01-26 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-25 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-25 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Environmental Quality
Department of Natural Resources
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Natural Resources
Public Budgeting
Department of Environmental Quality
Department of Natural Resources
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Natural Resources
Public Budgeting