UT SB0005 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue Bond and Capital Facilities Authorizations
Title
Revenue Bond and Capital Facilities Authorizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2011-03-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-10 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-10 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-03-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2011-03-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-03-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |