UT HR0901 | 2021 | 1st House Extraordinary Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution on Critical Race Theory in Public Education
Title
House Resolution on Critical Race Theory in Public Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-05-25 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-24 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-21 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-05-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-05-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |