UT HR0007 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Honoring Legislative Staff
Title
Resolution Honoring Legislative Staff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |