UT HR0006 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

House Rules Resolution -- Chamber Procedure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Rules Resolution -- Chamber Procedure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15 House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-04 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-04 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-25 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-25HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Rules Committee
2021-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee
2021-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Rules Committee
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-02-23HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-02-22 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-22 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-22 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
HR32101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
HR32313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
HR32505Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback