UT HR0004 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Urging Ratification of the Comprehensive Nuclear Test Ban Treaty
Title
Resolution Urging Ratification of the Comprehensive Nuclear Test Ban Treaty
Sponsors
Rep. Jen Seelig [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-08 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-05 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-04 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-02 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTGOC | |
2010-03-01 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2010-02-02 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |