UT HR0002 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Rules Resolution - Technical Corrections
Title
House Rules Resolution - Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-17 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-12 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-12 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-02-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
HR1 | 1 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR1 | 5 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR2 | 2 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR2 | 4 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR2 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR3 | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR3 | 2 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR3 | 2 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR3 | 2 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR3 | 2 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR4 | 1 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR4 | 3 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR4 | 4 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR4 | 7 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR4 | 8 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
HR4 | 9 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |