UT HR0001 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Rules Resolution on Standing Committee Hearings
Title
House Rules Resolution on Standing Committee Hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-04 | House | House Comm - Held in House Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House Comm - Held in House Rules Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2015-01-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House | |
2015-01-06 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2015-01-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2015/bills/static/HR0001.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2015/bills/hbillint/HR0001.pdf |