UT HR0001 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Rules Resolution on Voting Procedures
Title
House Rules Resolution on Voting Procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nielson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |