UT HR0001 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-06 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-06 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy Family Partnership House Resolution
Title
Healthy Family Partnership House Resolution
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Oda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-06 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-02-03 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in HSPEC | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2009-12-29 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2009-12-29 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HR0001.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hr0001.pdf |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillenr/hr0001.pdf |