UT HJR038 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution to Amend Rule of Evidence
Title
Joint Resolution to Amend Rule of Evidence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2011-03-09 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-28 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-24 | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-24 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-21 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-16 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |