UT HJR031 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ to House in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ to House in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on the Need to Be Self-sufficient
Title
Joint Resolution on the Need to Be Self-sufficient
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-04 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-03 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-28 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HJR031.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hjr031.pdf |
Roll Call | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/status/hbillsta/hjr031.001h.txt |