UT HJR019 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations Procedures Joint Resolution
Title
Appropriations Procedures Joint Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-18 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-18 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
JR3 | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR3 | 2 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR3 | 2 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR3 | 2 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR3 | 2 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
JR3 | 2 | 810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |