UT HJR014 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Rules Resolution Regarding Legislative Review Notes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Rules Resolution Regarding Legislative Review Notes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2018-03-15HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-12 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-12 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-08 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-03-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-03-08SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-03-02HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-27HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2018-02-13 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-13 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback