UT HJR013 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognition of Community Councils and the Association of Community Councils Together Joint Resolution
Title
Recognition of Community Councils and the Association of Community Councils Together Joint Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-02 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-26 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SSPEC | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-18 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPEC | |
2010-02-18 | House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in HSPEC | |
2010-02-01 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-01 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL | |
2010-01-29 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-28 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |