UT HJR010S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HJR010
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules Resolution Regarding a Long-term Planning Conference
Title
Joint Rules Resolution Regarding a Long-term Planning Conference
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2014-03-04 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-03 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP |
2014-02-15 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTGOP |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-11 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-02-11 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-11 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTEDW |
2014-02-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2014-02-05 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDW |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HJR010 (Replaces) 2014-02-11 - House/ substituted in HSUB