UT HJR006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Strangulation and Domestic Violence Joint Resolution
Title
Strangulation and Domestic Violence Joint Resolution
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Greiner [R] | Rep. Jen Seelig [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-16 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-10 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-10 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-02 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |