UT HJR003 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 20 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 20 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Authorizing Pay of In-session Employees
Title
Joint Resolution Authorizing Pay of In-session Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-01-21 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-20 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-20 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-20 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-01-20 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-01-20 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-19 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |