UT HJR001 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Amending State and Local Taxing Authority
Title
Joint Resolution Amending State and Local Taxing Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wimmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-27 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTREV | |
2011-01-27 | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTREV | |
2011-01-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-17 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HINTRO | |
2011-01-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HINTRO | |
2010-12-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Legislature
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
Revenue and Taxation
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
Revenue and Taxation