UT HB4002 | 2016 | 4th Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Class B and Class C Road Fund Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class B and Class C Road Fund Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-11-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-21 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2016-11-18 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Executive Branch - Governor
2016-11-17 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2016-11-17 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2016-11-17 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2016-11-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-11-16 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-11-16 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2016-11-16HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2016-11-16HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2016-11-16SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President
2016-11-16SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-11-16SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2016-11-16 Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2016-11-16SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-11-16SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-11-16HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-11-16 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House
2016-11-16 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Clerk of the House
2016-11-16 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2016-11-15 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-11-15 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback