UT HB0540 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lobbyist Disclosure and Regulation Amendments
Title
Lobbyist Disclosure and Regulation Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 11 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 11 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 11 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 11 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 11 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 11 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 24 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/HB0540.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/hbillint/HB0540.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2024/HB0540.fn.pdf |