UT HB0490 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband Internet Access Service Amendments
Title
Broadband Internet Access Service Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Consumer Protection
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Government Operations (State Issues)
Internet
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
State Institutions
Technology
Consumer Protection
Electronic Information
Electronic Privacy
Government Operations (State Issues)
Internet
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
State Institutions
Technology
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/HB0490.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0490.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0490.fn.pdf |