UT HB0486 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Water and Irrigation Amendments
Title
Water and Irrigation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-02-27 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-27 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-02-27 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-23 | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-23 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-23 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-23 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-15 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2012-02-15 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-14 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |