UT HB0474 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal and County Land Use and Development Revisions
Title
Municipal and County Land Use and Development Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 2 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 2 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/HB0474.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/hbillint/HB0474.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/HB0474.fn.pdf |