UT HB0466 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Special Service District Study
Title
Special Service District Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House/ failed (Y: 7 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Special Service District
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Special Service District