UT HB0463 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Inspector General
Title
Medicaid Inspector General
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-29 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-28 | House Comm - Held in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-27 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-23 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |