UT HB0456 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic Violations Around School Buses
Title
Traffic Violations Around School Buses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-03-02 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-02 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-03-02 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-02 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-02 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-03-01 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-28 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-28 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-27 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-22 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-21 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-16 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-16 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |