UT HB0445 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Debt Collection Notice Amendments
Title
Health Care Debt Collection Notice Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Miles [R] | Sen. Ann Millner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Amended out Comm amendment # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Reconsider actions (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Amended out Comm amendment # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Reconsider actions (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Amended out Comm amendment # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Reconsider actions in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Benefits/Claims, Health
Business
Collection Agencies
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance, Health
Business
Collection Agencies
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance, Health